Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
First National Bank Of Omaha, A Subsidiary Of First National Of Nebraska, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against George O Matthews, represented by Kurtis, Glen A., in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with John T Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn T Ellis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: August 12, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 16, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 16, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: December 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 11, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: February 03, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 10, 2022ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 16, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 16, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 04, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: March 14, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 02, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 11, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: March 11, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT UNSATISFIED INCOME EXECUTION |
||
March 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 11, 2022 | Affidavit of mailing | ||
March 11, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT military status |
||
March 11, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
March 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 02, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 25, 2022 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
February 10, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 10, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.