Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Autovest, L.L.C., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Cano, Pilar A, against Ronnie Carlson, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 18, 2022 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
March 04, 2022 | Affirmation pursuant to 202.27 | ||
February 28, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 28, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Mailing |
||
February 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Claimant Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Claimant Redacted |
||
February 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Status Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR Status Report Redacted |
||
February 28, 2022 | Affidavit of Non-Military Service | ||
August 20, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 11, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.