Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Austin Potter, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Breakstone, Samantha Allyne, Bross, Stephenie Lannigan, Leder, Linc, Slater, Joseph M, against Franklin County, Franklin County Department Of Social Services, Michelle A Miller A K A Michelle A. Duquette, Youth Advocacy Programs A K A Youth Advocacy Programs, Inc. A K A Youth Advocacy Program Of Franklin County, represented by Aspland, John Dutton, Darrow, Jessica Lynne, Debraccio, Steven Vincent, Dumas, Peter Arthur, Scolamiero, Peter M., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with L. Michael Mackey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeL. Michael Mackey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) Excerpted Defendant Miller HR file
Date: October 28, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 19, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: February 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 22, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: December 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 28, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 30, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 04, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) Excerpted Employment File for Defendant Miller
Date: October 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: October 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 12, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 01, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: December 16, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 16, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: February 25, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 18, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: February 16, 2022INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 22, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: October 28, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: October 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 09, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 09, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 06, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 05, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for service of conformed Order to Show Cause on Plaintiff |
||
December 05, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for service of conformed Order to Show Cause on Defendants |
||
December 01, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED | ||
November 30, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | ||
November 30, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 22, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
November 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Good Faith Letter dated 09/01/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.