Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Winograd, Ian Zev, against Michelle Law Aka Michelle L Foote, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 03, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 28, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 28, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: September 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 28, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
September 11, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
August 30, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
August 30, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF ADDITIONAL NOTICE |
||
August 18, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 03, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Michelle Law |
||
August 03, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.