Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against John J Cole, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 07, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 09, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1384092 | ||
September 09, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1384092 |
||
September 09, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1384092 |
||
September 09, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1384092 |
||
September 09, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1384092 |
||
August 11, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
August 11, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF ADDITIONAL NOTICE |
||
August 04, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.