Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Irving G. Gallagher, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mccann, Thomas H., against Nilsa I. Gallagher, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with John T Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn T Ellis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
March 02, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
March 02, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
March 02, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
February 28, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
February 16, 2022 | AMENDED JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
February 16, 2022 | AMENDED FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
January 03, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 03, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
November 24, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.