Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Robert Hardy, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 12, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 01, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
June 03, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 01, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
June 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
June 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
June 01, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
June 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
June 01, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
June 01, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
June 24, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.