Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Gerald W, Sheerin, John J, against Micael Cartier, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 11, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 28, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: August 12, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: June 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 28, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 29, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: July 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
July 29, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
July 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
July 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement |
||
June 18, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
June 18, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF ADDITIONAL NOTICE |
||
May 28, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF |
||
May 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-MICAEL CARTIER-47644343 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.