Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Keith Wells, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 28, 2021AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 23, 2021AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 23, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 12, 2021AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 23, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 16, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: June 16, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 23, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
November 23, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
November 23, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
November 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
November 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
November 23, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
November 23, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
June 16, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF ADDITIONAL MAILING |
||
June 16, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.