Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Arnold Lumber & Concrete, Larry Searles, Thomas Kerr, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Taylor, Wyman Robert, against Arnold Lumber & Concrete, Robert Searles, represented by Cartwright, Daniel Kenneth, Holland, Warren David, Honculada, Jehovenn Alviola, Lavoie, Matthew Dennis, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with John T Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn T Ellis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 16, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (General Negligence) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 16, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
July 06, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE *Corrected* 7-6-23_WRT to Court_Letter Order_Final PCSO |
||
June 28, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 12, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 26, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 15, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 10, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE 3-10-23_WRT to Court_Status Update_Amend PCSO? |
||
January 31, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
January 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Photos |
||
January 04, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendants' Supplemental Discovery Exchange |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.