Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Al536 Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Frament, Jason Allen, Lafave, Cynthia Susan, Stippel, Taylor Christine, Sutphin, Bruce A., against Christ Community Church, Christian Center Church Brockport, Ny, Christian Center Church Of Monroe County New York, Does 1-5 Whose Identities Are Unknown To Plaintiff, John Mcnamara, (total of 11) See All represented by Ganguly, Anjan K., Grainger, Michael Patrick, Jennette, Scott Robert, Luibrand, Kevin A, Misula, Roman Arthur, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with L. Michael Mackey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeL. Michael Mackey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: May 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2023 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Firm Address |
||
April 21, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
August 08, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) Ex D - 6.14.22 Request for Discovery Responses to Plaintiff's Counsel |
||
July 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Ex C - 4.5.22 Discovery Demands to Plaintiff's Counsel |
||
July 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Ex B - Christ Community Church's Answer |
||
July 27, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4) Attorney Affirmation in Support |
||
July 27, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) Christ Community Church's Notice of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses |
||
July 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Ex A - Summons & Complaint |
||
July 26, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.