Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Vanessa M Fish, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 10, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions73 days |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time155 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 10, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 04, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: May 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2019 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 14, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1262119 |
||
February 27, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING ADDITIONAL NOTICE |
||
February 27, 2019 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
February 26, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING ADDITIONAL NOTICE |
||
February 26, 2019 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
February 21, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1262119 |
||
February 21, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1262119 |
||
February 21, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1262119 |
||
February 21, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT R&R FILE # 1262119 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.