Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Community Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donovan, Linda L, against Jessalynn Carosella, represented by Francisco-Lau, Erica Maysan, Greco, Louis Carl, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with John T Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn T Ellis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management228 days |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time270 days |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: August 21, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 02, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2019 | Hearing |
TRIAL SET FOR ELLIS (Trial Part) Held Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
August 23, 2019 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 23, 2019 | Hearing |
POST-SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL ELLIS (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
August 21, 2019 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
August 21, 2019 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 09, 2019 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 18, 2019 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 15, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ELLIS (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
June 17, 2019 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
June 17, 2019 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED ELLIS (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.