Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Specialized Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Broyles, Mark K., Case, David P, Sposato, Melissa A., against Frances L. Perry As Administrator To The Estate Of Patsy A. Rousell A K A Patsy Rousell, Franklin County, John Doe #1 To #10, The Last 10 Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint,, United States Of America, O B O Internal Revenue Service, represented by Spina, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with Robert G Main presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert G Main Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 27, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time707 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #61) AFF OF MAIL FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE |
||
November 03, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #61) NOTICE OF ENTRY WITH JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE |
||
October 21, 2020 |
ORDER - REFEREE REPORT (Motion #61) ORDER CONFIRMING REFEREE REPORT AND JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE |
||
October 21, 2020 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
October 21, 2020 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Robert G. Main, Jr., A.J.S.C. |
||
October 21, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE-MOTION MAIN, JR. (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. ROBERT G. MAIN, JR. |
|
October 21, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #003) MAIN, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT G. MAIN, JR. |
|
September 25, 2020 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT STATUS/SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 21, 2020, AT 9:30 A.M. |
||
September 18, 2020 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE LETTER TO COURT |
||
September 18, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.