Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with John T. Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn T. Ellis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management130 days |
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2016 |
||
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
||
Case Cycle Time223 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED ELLIS (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
June 27, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ELLIS (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
June 07, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) ELLIS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
June 07, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) ELLIS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
May 18, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #003) ELLIS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
May 18, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) ELLIS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
May 12, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #003) ELLIS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
May 12, 2016 | Motion |
OPP TO OTSC (Motion #003) Before Justice: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
April 22, 2016 | Motion |
OTSC (Motion #002) Decided: 06/07/2016GRANTED Before Justice: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
April 22, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) ELLIS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.