Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with HON. JOHN T. ELLIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. JOHN T. ELLIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2018 |
CategoryRes. Foreclosure Conf Eligible |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time1082 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) ELLIS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
July 13, 2018 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED ELLIS (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
July 10, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) ELLIS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
June 11, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) ELLIS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
June 11, 2018 | Motion |
NOM TO DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #002) Decided: 07/13/2018GRANTED Before Justice: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
October 26, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) ELLIS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
October 25, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) ELLIS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
September 29, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) ELLIS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
September 29, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-NOTE OF ISSUE RESTORATION ELLIS (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
|
September 29, 2017 | Motion |
NOM - OOR (Motion #001) Decided: 10/26/2017GRANTED Before Justice: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. JOHN T. ELLIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.