Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kelly A. Johndrow, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Martin, Trinidad Martinez, against Richard J. Johndrow, represented by Whitson, Debra Ann, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts with Richard B Meyer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard B Meyer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 24, 2023 | ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST | ||
November 30, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE STIPULATION/ORDER CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL | ||
November 07, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 28, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 17, 2022 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
September 21, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 19, 2022 | ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST | ||
September 14, 2022 | NOTICE | ||
September 13, 2022 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.