Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eric Offhaus, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Cervi, Anthony Joseph, against Michelle Offhaus, represented by Walier, Paul Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Lynn W Keane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn W Keane Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 23, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2023 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
February 16, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
February 14, 2023 | ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
January 20, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
January 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 20, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 18, 2023 | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
January 18, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - M | ||
January 18, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - F | ||
January 18, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.