Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Robert Jeffery, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Licata, John Barry, against Maria Farinacci, Queen City Foods, Llc, represented by Bedenko, Alan Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with E Jeannette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeE Jeannette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 07, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 17, 2019ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 31, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: June 09, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 17, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 04, 2020ANSWER
Date: October 16, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED) Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 07, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 03, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 17, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 04, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: May 27, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: May 27, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 10, 2020RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY)
Date: September 23, 2021APPELLATE TERM ORDER (COPY)
Date: September 23, 2021APPELLATE TERM ORDER (COPY)
Date: September 14, 2021RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY)
Date: September 23, 2021ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: July 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | Hearing |
Part 35
Judge: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette |
|
March 09, 2023 | Hearing |
Commissioner of Jurors
Judge: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette |
|
February 22, 2023 | Hearing |
Judge: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette |
|
December 07, 2021 | Hearing |
Judge: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette |
|
September 27, 2021 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Ogden, Hon. E Jeannette |
|
September 23, 2021 | RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY) | ||
September 23, 2021 | APPELLATE TERM ORDER (COPY) | ||
September 23, 2021 |
RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
September 14, 2021 | APPELLATE TERM ORDER (COPY) | ||
July 22, 2021 | ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.