Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Ryan Habalou, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stamm, Brian G, against Michele St. Clair, represented by Adoff, Aaron Morris, Digati, Thomas Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Paul B. Wojtaszek presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul B. Wojtaszek Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Case Cycle Time159 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of New York, County of Erie. The plaintiff, Ryan Habalou, is suing the defendant, Michele St. Clair, for damages resulting from a car accident. The complaint alleges that on June 22, 2018,...
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 17, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: August 08, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 05, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002) Pltf's dep transcript
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002) Pltf's VBOP
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 28, 2022ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 20, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 28, 2022ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: December 27, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 12, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001) St. Joseph Hospital ER Records
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001) Progressive Insurance No-Fault medical file
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001) Plaintiffs ODD Responses
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - i 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001) Plaintiffs Verified Bill of Particulars
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 12, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2018NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: February 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 18, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 08, 2022 | TRIAL DOCUMENTS | ||
August 05, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) | ||
August 05, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) | ||
August 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Order granted 8/2/22 |
||
August 03, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #002) Bifurcate |
||
July 14, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) | ||
January 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Pltf's dep transcript Pltf's dep transcript Redacted |
||
January 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Pltf's VBOP Pltf's VBOP Redacted |
||
January 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Def's Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.