Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
James Alfiere, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Shear, Jason A, against David A. Cohen, Selip & Stylianou, Llp, represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Donna Siwek presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonna Siwek Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 24, 2015 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Fdcpa) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time500 days |
ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #001)
Date: February 15, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2016ANSWER *Corrected*
Date: February 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
March 30, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled - Other Part 29 Judge: Siwek, Hon. Donna M. |
|
February 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Part 29 Judge: Siwek, Hon. Donna M. |
|
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #001) | |
January 26, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Part 29 Judge: Siwek, Hon. Donna M. |
|
January 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Part 29 Judge: Siwek, Hon. Donna M. |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001) | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Responses to Notice to Admit |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Letter |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Secretary of State Printout |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.