Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kathy Hulbert, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Todoro, Joseph Anthony, Verrastro, James Peter, against Jaron Booker, Rhonda Duncan, represented by Hamberger, Douglas Paul, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Amy Martoche presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmy Martoche Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 21, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
||
January 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service- Rhonda Duncan |
||
January 04, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 04, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit of Due Diligence |
||
January 04, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer |
||
December 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Rhonda Duncan |
||
September 21, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Miscellaneous Disclosure Demands |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.