Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Paul Zinter, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by White, Justin Stillwell, against Galle Memorial Studio, Inc., Richard Zinter, represented by Tiveron, Diane R., in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Timothy Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 07, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 08, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 16, 2023 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
October 05, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 17, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Galle Memorial Studio, Inc. |
||
September 17, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Richard Zinter |
||
September 08, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
September 07, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 07, 2021 | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) | ||
September 07, 2021 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
September 07, 2021 | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.