Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Bernadine Dukes, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 02, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 02, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
December 02, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a credit document |
||
December 02, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 02, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
October 18, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 06, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 06, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 03, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
September 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C CHARGE OFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.