Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mary C. Pietrzak, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Mcgillicuddy, C Daniel, against Pyramid Walden Company Lp, The Children'S Place, The Children'S Place, Inc., The Children'S Place Services Company, Llc, Walden Galleria, (total of 5) See All represented by Appelbaum, Michael Eric, Holdsworth, Christina G., Osuna, Endell Julian, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Dennis Ward presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis Ward Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: October 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 24, 2022 | Answer to Amended Complaint | ||
January 10, 2022 | STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 10, 2021 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Commencement to NYS Department of Health |
||
November 12, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 12, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
November 09, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant Pyramid Walden Company, L.P. |
||
November 09, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant The Children's Place Services Company, LLC |
||
November 09, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant Walden Galleria Holdings, Inc. |
||
November 09, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant The Children's Place |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.