Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mark V. Wagner, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gurbacki, Robert H., against Grace Ann Daniel, Michael Sylvester, Norman G. Daniel, represented by Banker, Hilary C, Dominik , Jonathan Howard, Messina, Stephanie, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Dennis Ward presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis Ward Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 03, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 30, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: April 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2022NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: October 05, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2022SUMMONS
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2022 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
April 19, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Motion to Compel re: Discovery |
||
April 19, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in support of motion of Hilary C. Banker |
||
April 19, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of motion to compel |
||
April 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
||
April 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answers |
||
April 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) 12.13.21 email correspondence |
||
April 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Demand for Bill of Particulars |
||
April 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) 11.16.21 correspondence |
||
April 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) 3.30.22 email |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.