Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Amanda L. Brunner, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Miserendino, Samuel Richard, against Robert M. Brunner, represented by Gvertz, Daniel Solomon, Potts, Kellan Burton, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Mary L. Slisz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary L. Slisz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 08, 2022 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
December 08, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
November 29, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
November 16, 2022 | SEPARATION AGREEMENT - MODIFIED | ||
November 14, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 08, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
October 24, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
October 24, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) (POST RJI) | ||
October 19, 2022 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.