Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Norman Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 25, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 24, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2021 |
202.27-B MAILING RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE Moved left no address. Unable to forward. |
||
November 03, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION |
||
November 01, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 24, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 25, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q60693412901 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.