Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Anthony Tessari, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Welsh, Brian Richard, against Jessica Lyons, represented by Tupchik, Lana V., in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Raymond Walter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond Walter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
March 08, 2022 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
March 08, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
March 07, 2022 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
March 07, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - A | ||
March 07, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
March 07, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 04, 2022 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
January 31, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE | ||
January 25, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.