Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Robert Zink, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Shear, Jason A, against Midland Funding, Llc, Selip & Stylianou, Llp, represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Catherine Nugent Panepint presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine Nugent Panepint Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time354 days |
ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 05, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 05, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled - Other Part 2 Judge: Nugent Panepinto, Hon. Catherine R. |
|
August 09, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Part 2 Judge: Nugent Panepinto, Hon. Catherine R. |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001) | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT (Motion #001) | |
October 28, 2015 | Hearing |
Decision Reserved (Motion #001) Part 2 Judge: Nugent Panepinto, Hon. Catherine R. |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) | |
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.