Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ida R. Middagh, Lawrence Middagh, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Polak, David W., against Beverly A. Sawyer Trust, Victorian Springs Homeowners, represented by Culliton, Alyson Catherine, Deisinger, Adam Patrick, Grosso, James Charles, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Catherine Nugent Panepint presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine Nugent Panepint Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time425 days |
ANSWER
Date: October 09, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 13, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 11, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 16, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2016 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
September 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled - Other Part 2 Judge: Nugent Panepinto, Hon. Catherine R. |
|
September 13, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Part 2 Judge: Nugent Panepinto, Hon. Catherine R. |
|
February 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Part 2 Judge: Nugent Panepinto, Hon. Catherine R. |
|
January 06, 2016 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 19, 2015 |
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Substitution of Attorneys |
||
October 09, 2015 | ANSWER | ||
September 16, 2015 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer on behalf of Sawyer Family Trust sued herein as Beverly A. Sawyer Trust |
||
September 03, 2015 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 13, 2015 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.