Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Stiene, Charles, against And John Doe And Jane Doe #1 Through #7, The Last Seven Occupants, Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint,, Samuel E. Insalaco A K A Samuel Insalaco, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Frederick J Marshall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick J Marshall Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time272 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 07, 2015NOTICE
Date: September 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
May 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Part 5 Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
April 06, 2016 | Motion |
Cancel/Extend Lis Pendens (Motion #001) Decided: 05/03/2016Decided Before Justice: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NOTICE OF MOTION WITH RETURN DATE |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) FILED NOTICE OF PENDENCY |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) FILED AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) PROPOSED ORDER |
|
October 16, 2015 | Hearing |
Default - Unrepresented FCP Judge: Part (FCP), Foreclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.