Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Niagara Mohawk Power Corp. N K A National Grid, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Magnarelli, David J., against Town Of Amherst, represented by Demarie, Joseph, Sliwa, Stanley J., in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Tracey A Bannister presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTracey A Bannister Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1127 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2017ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001)
Date: September 12, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2018 | Hearing |
Settled Part 31 Judge: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. |
|
September 06, 2018 | Hearing |
Settled Part 31 Judge: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
July 17, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Part 31 Judge: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. |
|
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO DEFS NOTICE TO ADMIT |
|
February 26, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Part 31 Judge: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
December 20, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Part 31 Judge: Bannister, Hon. Tracey A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.