Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brandon Tatko, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Panepinto, Marc Charles, against Directv, Inc., Mastec Advanced Technologies, represented by Rubin, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Deborah Chimes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeborah Chimes Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time139 days |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 04, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 21, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001) | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Proposed Order |
|
October 26, 2015 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Part 33 Judge: Chimes, Hon. Deborah |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon Petitioner's counsel |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Petitioner's counsel's letter of Sept. 9, 2015 |
|
September 28, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Part 33 Judge: Chimes, Hon. Deborah |
|
September 14, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Part 33 Judge: Chimes, Hon. Deborah |
|
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MASTEC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.