Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jsj Holdings, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Carbone, Robert Christopher, against Aardee & Sons, Inc., Jayesh Patel, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Ejeannette Ogden presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEjeannette Ogden Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2021 |
JUDGMENT (Motion #001) JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on October 08, 2021 |
||
October 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to Statement for Judgment |
||
October 08, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 07, 2021 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
September 21, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 21, 2021 | JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #001) | ||
September 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
September 21, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) DHPG Statement |
||
July 30, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Jayesh Patel |
||
July 30, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Aardee & Sons, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.