Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Margaret Stansberry, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Arcuri, Kristin Langdon, Scinta, Deborah Jean, against Michael Yedinak Sr., represented by Cole, Michael Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Craig D Hannah presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig D Hannah Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
September 21, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 21, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
September 09, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 07, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
August 30, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - B | ||
August 30, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - A | ||
August 30, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | ||
August 30, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 09, 2021 | JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.