Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Jared J Link, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Welsh, Brian Richard, against Carolyn Link, represented by Dimillo, Anthony Angelo, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Deborah Chimes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeborah Chimes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
June 01, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
April 29, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
August 09, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 09, 2021 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
August 03, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
August 02, 2021 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
August 02, 2021 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
August 02, 2021 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
August 02, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.