Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Simone A Bonda, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 29, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 25, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: August 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 08, 2023 | ||
December 10, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Invoice For Service |
||
December 10, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Abstract of Driving Record |
||
December 10, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Charge-off Statement |
||
December 10, 2021 | Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor | ||
December 10, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Supplemental Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor |
||
December 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation |
||
December 10, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 10, 2021 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
August 31, 2021 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.