Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pb-72 Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Barr, Paul K., Fogel, Yitzchak Meir, against Joseph Gutowski, Karate Joe'S Family Karate Centers, Orchard Park Central School District, represented by Dechert, Heather, Friedman, Kathryn Bryk, Hayes, Meghan Mary, Luna, Jason C., Smith, Ryan Gregory, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel J Furlong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Furlong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 29, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 29, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
March 09, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 09, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
March 09, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 28, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 28, 2022 | Notice of Appeal of February 2, 2022 Order | ||
February 24, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
February 18, 2022 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
February 17, 2022 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Orchard Park CSD's Answer and Cross-Claim |
||
February 09, 2022 | Notice of Entry of February 2, 2022 Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.