Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Velocity Investments, Llc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Susan Mcdonald, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 29, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 28, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2021 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on October 02, 2021 | ||
September 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 29, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
August 23, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 28, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 28, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 29, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
June 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.