Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Golab, Mark, Sposato, Melissa A., Wallace, Lisa L, against Buffalo Metropolitan Federal Credit Union, John Doe #1 To John Doe #10, The Last 10 Names Being Fictitious And W1Known To Plaintiff The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Persons R Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint,, Keith Lewis, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Deborah Haendiges presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeborah Haendiges Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions518 days |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time832 days |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 24, 2017ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: June 20, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2016EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2016ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 01, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 31, 2015EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: August 30, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 11, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2017 | Notice of Entry of Order of Reference | ||
August 01, 2017 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
July 24, 2017 | Motion |
Vacate - Decision/Order/Judgment/Award (Motion #003) Decided: 07/24/2017Granted Before Justice: Haendiges, Deborah A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Haendiges, Deborah A. |
|
July 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #003) Part 9 Judge: Haendiges, Deborah A. |
|
May 24, 2017 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
May 24, 2017 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
May 24, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Filed Notice of Pendency |
||
May 24, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Filed Notice of Pendency |
||
May 24, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Filed Affidavit of Service |
||
May 24, 2017 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.