Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
M&T Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ruuska, Ryan E, against Citibank, N.A., John Doe #1- #50 And Mary Roe #1- #50, The Last Two Names Being Fictitious, It Being Intended To Name All Other Parties Who May Have Some Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint, Milton Brown, Monogram Credit Card Bank Of Georgia Issuer Of The Exxon Mobil Credit Card, The Summit Federal Credit Union, (total of 5) See All represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with John O'Donnell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn O'Donnell Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions302 days |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time305 days |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)
Date: January 26, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 28, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on October 19, 2016 | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Mail |
|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) | |
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #002) JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 02, 2016 |
|
April 29, 2016 | Motion |
Judgment - Foreclosure & Sale (Motion #002) Decided: 04/29/2016Decided Before Justice: O'Donnell, Hon. John F. Answer demanded: No Judge: O'Donnell, Hon. John F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.