Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Bonnie L. Locking, Harlan T. Locking, John Doe "John Doe # 1 Through John Doe # 12, " The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premi, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Deborah Chimes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeborah Chimes Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions358 days |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time407 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: March 17, 2017EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 10, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #004) | |
June 12, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #004) Part 33 Judge: Chimes, Hon. Deborah |
|
April 24, 2017 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #004) Decided: 06/12/2017Granted Before Justice: Chimes, Hon. Deborah Answer demanded: No Judge: Chimes, Hon. Deborah |
|
April 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #004) Part 33 Judge: Chimes, Hon. Deborah |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004) ORDER DISCONTINUING ACTION, CANCELLING NOP AND VACATING THE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #004) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF DISCONTINUANCE OF ACTION, CANCELLATION OF NOP AND VACATUR OF JUDGMENT OF F |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #004) AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CPLR 2106 |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004) NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE THE ACTION, CANCEL THE NOP AND VACATE THE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AN |
|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.