Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
National Fuel Gas Supply Corporation, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Leslie, Craig A., Silverstein, Michael, Taylor, Paul E, against Brad B Prusak, Gerald Whittington Jr, Lori Whittington, Robert E Mamon, Ryan Secord, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Michael L. D'Amico presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael L. D'Amico Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time27 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)
Date: July 02, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2015 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Michael L. D'Amico (Mtn) Judge: D'Amico, Hon. Michael L. |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order signed by Hon Michael L. D'Amico, A.J.S.C. on July 29, 2015, and filed and entered in the Erie |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Hand Delivery of National Fuel Gas Supply Corporation's Affidavit of Regularity of Paul Morrison-Tay |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Fed Ex on all respondents on July 13, 2015 regarding Amended Petition, Order |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION Amended Petition with Exhibit A and RJI |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Shirley Mamon |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Robert Mamon |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Ryan Secord |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Yomaira Prusak |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Brad B. Prusak |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.