Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc D B A Champion Mortgage Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Golab, Mark, Sposato, Melissa A., Wallace, Lisa L, against Amber Damico, John Doe #1 To John Doe #10, The Last 10 Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint,, Michael V Damico As Heir And Administrator Of The Estate Of Patricia Adamico, Midland Funding Llc, New Century Financial Services, Inc., (total of 8) See All represented by Fleming, Mary Enright, Longo, Mark Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with James Dillon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Dillon Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions811 days |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time854 days |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #003)
Date: September 20, 2017JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #003)
Date: November 02, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 08, 2018 | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Report of Sale, Statement, Receipt, Affidavit of Publication, Terms of Sale, and Memorandum of Sale |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #003) JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 02, 2017 |
|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK (Motion #003) | |
October 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #003) Part 3 Judge: Dillon, Hon. James H. |
|
October 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Part 3 Judge: Dillon, Hon. James H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.