Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jocelyn Petko, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Higgins, Terrence Patrick, against Town Of Tonawanda, represented by Gellman, Ryan Lance, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with James Dillon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Dillon Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time705 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2015ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001)
Date: May 30, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 04, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001) | |
May 03, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Part 3 Judge: Dillon, Hon. James H. |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | |
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Relieve pltf counsel |
|
March 29, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Part 3 Judge: Dillon, Hon. James H. |
|
March 29, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Part 3 Judge: Dillon, Hon. James H. |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affidavit of Ryan Gellman, Esq. |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) In response to defendant's motion to dismiss |
|
February 28, 2017 | Motion |
Dismiss Complaint (Motion #001) Decided: 05/03/2017Decided Before Justice: Dillon, Hon. James H. Answer demanded: No Judge: Dillon, Hon. James H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.