Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Patricia Eisenbeis, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Barone, Robert David, Braun, Michele Ann, against Kaleida Health D B A Buffalo General Hospital, represented by Dunbar, Joseph W., Oliveri, Victor Alan, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Frederick J Marshall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick J Marshall Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Time To Trial91 days |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1048 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 15, 2018ANSWER
Date: July 29, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 06, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
December 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
September 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Part 5 Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
September 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Part 5 Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | |
April 04, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Part 5 Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
October 12, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Part 5 Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
March 01, 2016 | Hearing |
Held John M. Curran (Trial Part) Judge: Curran, Hon. John M. |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Scheduling Order |
|
October 01, 2015 | Hearing |
Held John M. Curran (Trial Part) Judge: Curran, Hon. John M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.