Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, against John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, Michael S. Napierala, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Russell P Buscaglia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRussell P Buscaglia Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions657 days |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time764 days |
John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 22, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 22, 2015JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2016 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
January 20, 2016 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 20, 2016 | ||
January 15, 2016 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
December 04, 2015 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
December 03, 2015 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 03, 2015 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY JFS |
||
October 07, 2015 |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #001) JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on October 07, 2015 |
||
October 07, 2015 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
October 06, 2015 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Part 14 Judge: Buscaglia, Hon. Russell P. |
|
August 05, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Part 14 Judge: Buscaglia, Hon. Russell P. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.