Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Wenzel, Scott Louis, against Jamilla Peay, Prudential Assigned Settlement Services Corp., Prudential Insurance Company Of America, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Lynn W Keane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn W Keane Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Sspa) |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: April 07, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 07, 2022ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: June 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2022 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
June 17, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Final Order |
||
June 10, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 20, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 18, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
April 07, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) | ||
April 07, 2022 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
April 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C FedEx Confirmation |
||
April 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Payment Schedule |
||
April 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Disclosure Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.