Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
New York Life Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Joseph, Linda H., Millioen, Tiffany Celia, against Brian Smith, Isaac Nicholson, Karen Kittel Copeland, Lisa Anderson, Paul Nicholson, (total of 5) See All represented by Steiner, Richard Jay, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Diane Devlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane Devlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Interpleader) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time213 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 28, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 17, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
September 22, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 04, 2020 | BILL OF COSTS (Motion #001) | ||
September 04, 2020 | Notice of Entry of Order | ||
August 28, 2020 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Decision Reserved (Motion #001) Part 32 Judge: Devlin, Hon. Diane |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001) REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Anderson Cross-claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.